AL SB208 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:45 p.m. on April 26, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:45 p.m. on April 26, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substances, Schedule I, cathinone compounds, synthetic cannabinoid, controlled analog substances, included and subject to regulation and penalties, penalties for trafficking in controlled analog substances, Sec. 13A-12-214.1, 13A-12-231, 20-2-23, am'd (2012-20047)
Title
Controlled substances, Schedule I, cathinone compounds, synthetic cannabinoid, controlled analog substances, included and subject to regulation and penalties, penalties for trafficking in controlled analog substances, Sec. 13A-12-214.1, 13A-12-231, 20-2-23, am'd (2012-20047)
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Brewbaker [R] | Sen. Jerry Fielding [D] | Sen. Arthur Orr [R] | Sen. Bryan Taylor [R] |
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Faust motion to Table (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Faust motion to Table (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Forwarded to Governor at 1:45 p.m. on April 26, 2012 | |
2012-04-26 | Assigned Act No. 2012-267. | |
2012-04-26 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-26 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-26 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1012 | |
2012-04-26 | Faust motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1011 | |
2012-04-26 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-23 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 150 | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 149 | |
2012-02-23 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |