AL SB206 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on May 3, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on May 3, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2009 First Special Session and 2010 Regular Session as contained in 2010 supplements and replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local permanent laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State
Title
Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2009 First Special Session and 2010 Regular Session as contained in 2010 supplements and replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local permanent laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on May 3, 2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2011-236. | |
2011-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-03 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 574 | |
2011-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Internal Affairs | |
2011-04-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 168 | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |