AL SB205 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Assigned Act No. 2022-353.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Assigned Act No. 2022-353.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Code of Alabama, procedure for transmitting sets to members of Legislature, revised, Sec. 41-21-1 am'd.
Title
Code of Alabama, procedure for transmitting sets to members of Legislature, revised, Sec. 41-21-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 554 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - SBIR: Beasley motion to Adopt Roll Call 553 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - SBIR: Beasley motion to Adopt Roll Call 553 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-353. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-05 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-04-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Voice Vote 898 |
2022-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 554 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |