AL SB205 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Assigned Act No. 2018-181.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Craft Training Board, members, terms and term limits, bd reappointed, Sec. 41-4-412 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Craft Training Board, members, terms and term limits, bd reappointed, Sec. 41-4-412 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-181.
2018-03-01HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-01SenateEnrolled
2018-03-01SenatePassed Second House
2018-02-27HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 519
2018-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2018-02-01SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 272
2018-02-01SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-30SenateReported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable
2018-01-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback