AL SB205 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-388.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion, Department of Public Health may not issue or renew licenses of clinics located near schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion, Department of Public Health may not issue or renew licenses of clinics located near schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Lee motion to Previous Question (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Henry motion to Table (Y: 74 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-388.
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04HouseHall intended to vote "Nay"
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04SenatePassed Second House
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 882
2016-05-04HouseLee motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 881
2016-05-04HouseHenry motion to Table adopted Roll Call 880
2016-05-04HouseHealth Amendment Offered
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-03-22HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2016-03-22SenateEngrossed
2016-03-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 440
2016-03-22SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 439
2016-03-22SenateSanford Amendment Offered
2016-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-15SenateSanford motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-03-15SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-02-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB205
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/SB205-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=541935&VOTE=439&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=541936&VOTE=440&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552304&VOTE=880&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552321&VOTE=881&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552322&VOTE=882&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback