AL SB204 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic and Foreign Corporations; annual report requirement removed
Title
Domestic and Foreign Corporations; annual report requirement removed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 321 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Sessions motion to Adopt - Roll Call 320 TE6K159-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Sessions motion to Adopt - Roll Call 320 TE6K159-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-09 | House | Pending House Commerce and Small Business |
2024-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 321 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Sessions motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 320 TE6K159-1 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Amendment Offered TE6K159-1 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Amendment TE6K159-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
HB230 (Same As) 2024-05-07 - Enacted