AL SB203 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on May 9, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on May 9, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dental Examiners, Board of, licensure of dentists, authorized to charge and collect impaired annual monitoring fee, president to designate any board member to issue subpoenas, depositions relating to board matters further provided for, Secs. 34-9-1, 34-9-4, 34-9-6, 34-9-7, 34-9-7.2, 34-9-8, 34-9-9, 34-9-10, 34-9-12, 34-9-13, 34-9-14, 34-9-15, 34-9-16, 34-9-18, 34-9-22, 34-9-26, 34-9-27, 34-9-28, 34-9-40, 34-9-46, 34-9-47, 34-38-2 am'd.
Title
Dental Examiners, Board of, licensure of dentists, authorized to charge and collect impaired annual monitoring fee, president to designate any board member to issue subpoenas, depositions relating to board matters further provided for, Secs. 34-9-1, 34-9-4, 34-9-6, 34-9-7, 34-9-7.2, 34-9-8, 34-9-9, 34-9-10, 34-9-12, 34-9-13, 34-9-14, 34-9-15, 34-9-16, 34-9-18, 34-9-22, 34-9-26, 34-9-27, 34-9-28, 34-9-40, 34-9-46, 34-9-47, 34-38-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-252. |
2013-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1128 |
2013-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 479 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 478 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Bussman first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |