AL SB201 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Assigned Act No. 2017-321.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Assigned Act No. 2017-321.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, nonconsensual towing of, Law Enforcement Agency authorized to regulate, service charge dispute resolution process, adoption of rules, civil penalties
Title
Motor vehicles, nonconsensual towing of, Law Enforcement Agency authorized to regulate, service charge dispute resolution process, adoption of rules, civil penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-321. |
2017-05-16 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-05-16 | House | Wilcox filed a Conflict of Interest Declaration |
2017-05-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 888 |
2017-05-16 | House | Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 887 |
2017-05-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 262 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 261 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reed first Substitute Offered |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reed motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |