AL SB200 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-439.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-439.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor fuels, consigned, taking without consent of owner of consignor or written agreement constitutes theft, penalties, Secs. 13A-8-75 to 13A-8-77, inclusive, added
Title
Motor fuels, consigned, taking without consent of owner of consignor or written agreement constitutes theft, penalties, Secs. 13A-8-75 to 13A-8-77, inclusive, added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-439. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-06-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1267 |
2015-06-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-31 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 221 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 220 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |