AL SB20 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Marriage, contract for, recording by judge of probate, transmission to Vital Statistics office, content of contract, Secs. 30-1-9, 30-1-10, 30-1-11, 30-1-13, 30-1-14 repealed; Secs. 22-9A-17, 30-1-5, 30-1-12, 30-1-16 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage, contract for, recording by judge of probate, transmission to Vital Statistics office, content of contract, Secs. 30-1-9, 30-1-10, 30-1-11, 30-1-13, 30-1-14 repealed; Secs. 22-9A-17, 30-1-5, 30-1-12, 30-1-16 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20HouseJudiciary first Amendment Offered
2017-04-20HousePending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
2017-04-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-03-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2017-03-07SenateEngrossed
2017-03-07SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 223
2017-03-07SenateAlbritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 222
2017-03-07SenateAlbritton Amendment Offered
2017-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-02-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback