AL SB20 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driving or operating a vehicle as defined (including vessels) under the influence of alcohol or drugs, criminal negligent homicide or assault in the first degree amended to include, Secs. 13A-6-4, 13A-6-20 am'd.
Title
Driving or operating a vehicle as defined (including vessels) under the influence of alcohol or drugs, criminal negligent homicide or assault in the first degree amended to include, Secs. 13A-6-4, 13A-6-20 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2013-03-20 | House | Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the first time |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 124 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |