AL SB20 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities, ordinances, planning, zoning, or licensing of businesses, publication or posting further provided for, Sec. 11-45-8 am'd.
Title
Municipalities, ordinances, planning, zoning, or licensing of businesses, publication or posting further provided for, Sec. 11-45-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-618. | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 392 | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1057 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 391 | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 390. | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-27 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |