AL SB2 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Retirement, Deferred Retirement Option Plan (DROP), options for Tier I and Tier II members to participate, reopened, Secs. 16-25-150, 16-25-151, 36-27-170, 36-27-171 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement, Deferred Retirement Option Plan (DROP), options for Tier I and Tier II members to participate, reopened, Secs. 16-25-150, 16-25-151, 36-27-170, 36-27-171 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09HousePending third reading on day 11 Favorable from State Government
2017-03-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2017-02-23SenateEngrossed
2017-02-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 77
2017-02-21SenateWilliams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 76
2017-02-21SenateWilliams Amendment Offered
2017-02-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-02-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback