AL SB2 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Human Resources Department, children, legal custody, kinship guardianship, dept. not required to consider out-of-state relative if no contact within six months, Sec. 12-15-314 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Resources Department, children, legal custody, kinship guardianship, dept. not required to consider out-of-state relative if no contact within six months, Sec. 12-15-314 am'd.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-28SenateIndefinitely Postponed
2016-03-15SenateGlover motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2016-03-15SenateHealth and Human Services first Substitute Offered
2016-03-15SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2016-02-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback