AL SB2 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Assigned Act No. 2015-49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Municipal Electric Authority, board of directors, number of members increased, compensation of board members and accounting firm further provided for, Sec. 11-50A-6 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Electric Authority, board of directors, number of members increased, compensation of board members and accounting firm further provided for, Sec. 11-50A-6 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-14SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-49.
2015-04-14HouseSignature Requested
2015-04-14SenateEnrolled
2015-04-14SenatePassed Second House
2015-04-09HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 321
2015-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-04-02HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
2015-03-19SenateEngrossed
2015-03-18SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 159
2015-03-18SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 158
2015-03-18SenateDial Amendment Offered
2015-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-03-18SenateDial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-03-18SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-03-05SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB2
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB2-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB2-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB2-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=505787&VOTE=158&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=505788&VOTE=159&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=509842&VOTE=321&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback