AL SB2 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-435.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-435.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Capital offenses, murder of a person with a protection order issued against the defendant, included, Kelley's Law, Sec. 13A-5-40 am'd.
Title
Capital offenses, murder of a person with a protection order issued against the defendant, included, Kelley's Law, Sec. 13A-5-40 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-435. |
2014-04-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-04-02 | House | Mitchell dissent filed |
2014-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1084 |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 417 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Scofield motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |