AL SB199 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medical transport providers, assessment period extended
Title
Emergency medical transport providers, assessment period extended
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 323 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-04 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 323 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
Same As/Similar To
HB324 (Same As) 2024-05-07 - Enacted