AL SB199 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical services, establish the age of consent for medical research, Sec. 22-8-4 am'd.
Title
Medical services, establish the age of consent for medical research, Sec. 22-8-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Health |
2017-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 396 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Health and Human Services as Favorable |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |