AL SB197 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, tax credit, authorized for the cost of acquisition and construction of a qualified storm shelter
Title
Taxation, tax credit, authorized for the cost of acquisition and construction of a qualified storm shelter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Whatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and rereferred to committee Finance and Taxation Education |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry |