AL SB197 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1180
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Filing a false lien against public officer or employee, crime established, penalties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Filing a false lien against public officer or employee, crime established, penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Knight motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1180
2011-06-09 Knight motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1179
2011-06-09 Judiciary Committee Amendment reported
2011-06-09 Third Reading Passed
2011-05-05 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2011-04-12 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2011-04-12 Engrossed
2011-04-12 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 238
2011-04-12 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 237
2011-04-12 Waggoner first Substitute Offered
2011-04-12 Third Reading Passed
2011-03-31 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-03-10 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB197
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB197-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB197-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=403746&VOTE=237&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=403747&VOTE=238&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=422459&VOTE=1179&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=422240&VOTE=1180&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback