AL SB196 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2022-256.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2022-256.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Death sentences, Governor required to provide prior notice when granting a reprieve or commutation to Attorney General and to family member of victim, const. amend.
Title
Death sentences, Governor required to provide prior notice when granting a reprieve or commutation to Attorney General and to family member of victim, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 297 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - SBIR: Livingston motion to Adopt Roll Call 296 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - SBIR: Livingston motion to Adopt Roll Call 296 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-256. |
2022-04-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-04-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Voice Vote 918 |
2022-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 297 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |