AL SB196 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-383.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, from the Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to various school systems and colleges and universities, and other entities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, from the Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to various school systems and colleges and universities, and other entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-383.
2019-05-30HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled
2019-05-29SenatePassed Second House
2019-05-28HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1083
2019-05-28HousePoole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1082
2019-05-28HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2019-05-28HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-05-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2019-05-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 546
2019-05-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback