AL SB196 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Workers' compensation, additional penalties for fraud, restitution, termination of benefits, repayment, Sec. 13A-11-124 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation, additional penalties for fraud, restitution, termination of benefits, repayment, Sec. 13A-11-124 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HousePending third reading on day 22 Favorable from State Government
2017-04-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-06HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2017-04-06SenateEngrossed
2017-04-06SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 492
2017-04-06SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 491
2017-04-06SenateFiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-06SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-06SenateFiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute Offered
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-02-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2017-02-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback