AL SB196 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid programs, ensuring appropriate access to medicines for premature infants, created, Medicaid program required to develop and implement policies to streamline process for access to covered drug for premature infants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid programs, ensuring appropriate access to medicines for premature infants, created, Medicaid program required to develop and implement policies to streamline process for access to covered drug for premature infants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-26 Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Health
2012-04-26 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-04-19 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2012-04-12 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 568
2012-04-12 Third Reading Passed
2012-03-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-07 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback