AL SB193 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Assigned Act No. 2019-204.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Unemployment benefits, maximum amount paid to an individual revised contingent on the state's average unemployment rate, maximum weekly benefits revised, terms of losing benefits due to disqualification, Secs. 25-4-72, 25-4-74, 25-4-78 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment benefits, maximum amount paid to an individual revised contingent on the state's average unemployment rate, maximum weekly benefits revised, terms of losing benefits due to disqualification, Secs. 25-4-72, 25-4-74, 25-4-78 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Garrett motion to Table (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-204.
2019-05-14SenateEnrolled
2019-05-14SenatePassed Second House
2019-05-14HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 672
2019-05-14HouseGarrett motion to Table adopted Roll Call 671
2019-05-14HouseClarke Amendment Offered
2019-05-14HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-02HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
2019-04-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 353
2019-04-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB193&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB193-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB193-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201188-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612251&VOTE=353&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=618419&VOTE=671&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=618485&VOTE=672&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback