AL SB193 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Briarwood Presbyterian Church, authorized to hire certified law enforcement officers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Briarwood Presbyterian Church, authorized to hire certified law enforcement officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20HousePending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
2017-04-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2017-04-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 513
2017-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-06SenateWaggoner motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-03-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback