AL SB192 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Financial Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Financial Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Securities Commission, directors salary to be fixed by commission with approval of State Personnel Board, Sec. 8-6-56 am'd.
Title
Securities Commission, directors salary to be fixed by commission with approval of State Personnel Board, Sec. 8-6-56 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Financial Services |
2016-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 183 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |