AL SB192 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Traffic stops, racial profiling by law enforcement officers, prohibited, written policies, forms for statistics, and reports to Attorney General required, provision for complaints
Title
Traffic stops, racial profiling by law enforcement officers, prohibited, written policies, forms for statistics, and reports to Attorney General required, provision for complaints
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary |
2015-06-03 | House | Reported from Judiciary as Favorable |
2015-05-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1273 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |