AL SB192 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Forwarded to Governor at 12:30 p.m. on April 4, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Forwarded to Governor at 12:30 p.m. on April 4, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Highway Finance Corporation, borrowing power clarified, Governor added as member of authority, proceeds of bonds, use by counties and municipalities to match federal funds, Secs. 23-1-174, 23-1-177, 23-1-178, 23-1-181 am'd.
Title
Highway Finance Corporation, borrowing power clarified, Governor added as member of authority, proceeds of bonds, use by counties and municipalities to match federal funds, Secs. 23-1-174, 23-1-177, 23-1-178, 23-1-181 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - McCutcheon motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - McCutcheon motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 12:30 p.m. on April 4, 2013 |
2013-04-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-80. |
2013-04-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-04-04 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 298 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2013-03-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 223 |
2013-03-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 222 |
2013-03-20 | House | Holmes 2nd Amendment Offered |
2013-03-20 | House | McCutcheon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 221 |
2013-03-20 | House | Holmes 1st Amendment Offered |
2013-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 157 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 156 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Bussman Amendment Offered |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |