AL SB191 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic Beverages Control Board; ability to own its warehouses authorized
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Control Board; ability to own its warehouses authorized
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Givhan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1139 (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 688 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 688 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-08 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1139 |
2024-05-07 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-30 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-23 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 688 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |