AL SB191 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Assigned Act No. 2021-331.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Assigned Act No. 2021-331.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lyman Ward Military Academy, appropriation
Title
Lyman Ward Military Academy, appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 984 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Oliver motion to Adopt Roll Call 983 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 676 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 675 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Oliver motion to Adopt Roll Call 983 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 676 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 675 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-331. |
2021-04-27 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 984 |
2021-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 676 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
Same As/Similar To
HB302 (Same As) 2021-02-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education