AL SB191 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-505.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Asset forfeitures, Attorney General, to establish and maintain a case tracking system relating to property seized and forfeited

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Asset forfeitures, Attorney General, to establish and maintain a case tracking system relating to property seized and forfeited

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-505.
2019-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor at 2:12 p.m. on May 30, 2019
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled
2019-05-30HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-30SenatePassed Second House
2019-05-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1192
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-30HouseRowe motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2019-05-29HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-28SenateEngrossed
2019-05-28SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1242
2019-05-28SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1241
2019-05-28SenateOrr second Substitute Offered
2019-05-28SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-28SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-28SenateOrr first Substitute Offered
2019-05-28SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-05-16SenateReed motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-16SenateJones motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 877
2019-05-16SenateJones Amendment Offered
2019-05-16SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 876
2019-05-16SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-04-04SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2019-04-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB191&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB191-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB191-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB191-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201160-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201475-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201948-3.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620410&VOTE=876&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620421&VOTE=877&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=624649&VOTE=1241&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=624650&VOTE=1242&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626457&VOTE=1192&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback