AL SB191 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Assigned Act No. 2015-125.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Assigned Act No. 2015-125.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Postsecondary Education, State Board of, established, transfer of responsibility over two-year institutions of higher education from the State Board of Education and the State Department of Education to the State Board of Postsecondary Education and the State Department of Postsecondary Education, Secs. 16-60-110.1, 16-60-111, 16-60-111.10, 16-60-111.11, 16-60-111.12, 16-60-111.13, 16-60-111.14, 16-60-111.15, 16-60-111.16, 16-60-116, 16-60-117 added; Secs. 16-60-110, 16-60-111.1, 16-60-111.2, 16-60-111.3, 16-60-111.4, 16-60-111.5, 16-60-111.6, 16-60-111.7, 16-60-111.8, 16-60-111.9, 16-60-112, 16-60-113, 16-60-114, 16-60-115 am'd.
Title
Postsecondary Education, State Board of, established, transfer of responsibility over two-year institutions of higher education from the State Board of Education and the State Department of Education to the State Board of Postsecondary Education and the State Department of Postsecondary Education, Secs. 16-60-110.1, 16-60-111, 16-60-111.10, 16-60-111.11, 16-60-111.12, 16-60-111.13, 16-60-111.14, 16-60-111.15, 16-60-111.16, 16-60-116, 16-60-117 added; Secs. 16-60-110, 16-60-111.1, 16-60-111.2, 16-60-111.3, 16-60-111.4, 16-60-111.5, 16-60-111.6, 16-60-111.7, 16-60-111.8, 16-60-111.9, 16-60-112, 16-60-113, 16-60-114, 16-60-115 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - House - McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-125. |
2015-05-05 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2015-05-05 | House | McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 582 |
2015-05-05 | House | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 822 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Executive Amendment Offered |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-05 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-05 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 746 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Bussman motion to non-concur and request Conference Committee, Pittman to table Bussman motion Tables Voice Vote |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 483 |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 482 |
2015-04-23 | House | Education Policy first Substitute Offered |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-31 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Pittman motion to Reconsider and Table adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 201 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Adopt Pittman Sub as Amended adopted Roll Call 200 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Bussman Amendment Offered |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Adopt Lost Roll Call 199 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Dial Amendment Offered |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Pittman first Substitute Offered |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Pittman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |