AL SB191 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Treadaway intended to vote "Yea"
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Treadaway intended to vote "Yea"
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Open Meetings Act, prohibit serial meetings, to clarify Open Meetings Act applies to meeting of the Legislature, committees, or subcommittees of governmental bodies, penalties, Secs. 36-25A-1, 36-25A-2, 36-25A-3, 36-25A-9 am'd.
Title
Alabama Open Meetings Act, prohibit serial meetings, to clarify Open Meetings Act applies to meeting of the Legislature, committees, or subcommittees of governmental bodies, penalties, Secs. 36-25A-1, 36-25A-2, 36-25A-3, 36-25A-9 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Treadaway intended to vote "Yea" |
2014-04-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1137 |
2014-04-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1136 |
2014-04-03 | House | Ethics and Campaign Finance first Substitute Offered |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-19 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-03-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 594 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 593 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hightower Amendment Offered |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 592 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Ward first Substitute Offered |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |