AL SB191 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Human Resources Department, public assistance, drug testing for applicants and recipients required upon reasonable suspicion, ineligibility under certain conditions, department to implement, rulemaking authority
Title
Human Resources Department, public assistance, drug testing for applicants and recipients required upon reasonable suspicion, ineligibility under certain conditions, department to implement, rulemaking authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from State Government |
2013-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2013-04-24 | House | Read for the first time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 540 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Pittman motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 262 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 261 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability first Substitute Offered |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |