AL SB190 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-391.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-391.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental appropriations from Education Trust Fund to specified agencies, supp. approp. for fiscal year ending Sept. 30, 2021.
Title
Supplemental appropriations from Education Trust Fund to specified agencies, supp. approp. for fiscal year ending Sept. 30, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1186 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 980 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 979 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 978 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Poole motion to Adopt Roll Call 977 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 686 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 685 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 684 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 980 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 979 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 978 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Poole motion to Adopt Roll Call 977 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 686 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 685 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 684 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-391. |
2021-04-29 | House | Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1186 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 980 |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 979 |
2021-04-27 | House | Poole Amendment Offered |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 978 |
2021-04-27 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2021-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 686 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 685 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Orr first Substitute Offered |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable with 1 substitute |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
Same As/Similar To
HB299 (Same As) 2021-02-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education