AL SB190 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned Act No. 2019-223.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned Act No. 2019-223.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Courts, magistrates and clerks of circuit and district courts, absolute judicial immunity granted under certain conditions
Title
Courts, magistrates and clerks of circuit and district courts, absolute judicial immunity granted under certain conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-223. |
2019-05-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 674 |
2019-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 324 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 323 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |