AL SB190 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, notification of absentee voter of defective and uncounted ballot, Sec. 17-11-10 am'd.
Title
Elections, notification of absentee voter of defective and uncounted ballot, Sec. 17-11-10 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Amendment Offered |
2017-04-27 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections third Amendment Offered |
2017-04-27 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections second Amendment Offered |
2017-04-27 | House | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections with 3 amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 460 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 459 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Figures Amendment Offered |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 458 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Constitution, Ethics and Elections Amendment Offered |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections |