AL SB190 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Holley motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1569
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Administrative Procedure Act, rules, Governor to approve new rules before they are certified, withdrawal by agency proposing, Chair of Joint Committee on Administrative Regulation Review auth. to approve, Secs. 41-22-6, 41-22-7, 41-22-23 am'd; Sec. 41-22-23.1 added (2012-20352)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative Procedure Act, rules, Governor to approve new rules before they are certified, withdrawal by agency proposing, Chair of Joint Committee on Administrative Regulation Review auth. to approve, Secs. 41-22-6, 41-22-7, 41-22-23 am'd; Sec. 41-22-23.1 added (2012-20352)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-19 - Senate - Holley motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House of Representatives - Galliher motion to Accede (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House of Representatives - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House of Representatives - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House of Representatives - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House of Representatives - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House of Representatives - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Holley motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1569
2012-05-16 Conference Committee on SB190 2012RS first Substitute Offered
2012-05-16 Conference Report
2012-05-16 Conference Committee Appointed
2012-05-16 Galliher motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1530 House appoints McClendon, Hill and Knight
2012-05-16 Conference Committee Requested
2012-05-09 Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1272 P&PO appoints Figures, Holley and Marsh
2012-05-09 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1415
2012-05-09 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1414
2012-05-09 SG 3rd Amendment Offered
2012-05-09 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1413
2012-05-09 SG 2nd Amendment Offered
2012-05-09 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1412
2012-05-09 SG 1st Amendment Offered
2012-05-09 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1411
2012-05-09 State Government first Substitute Offered
2012-05-09 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-08 Reported from State Government as Favorable with 1 substitute and with 3 amendments
2012-03-15 Engrossed
2012-03-20 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2012-03-15 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 308
2012-03-15 Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 307
2012-03-15 Holley Amendment Offered
2012-03-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 306
2012-03-15 Holley Amendment Offered
2012-03-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 305
2012-03-15 Holley first Substitute Offered
2012-03-15 Third Reading Passed
2012-02-21 Holley to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair granted
2012-02-21 Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2012-02-14 Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable
2012-02-07 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB190
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB190-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB190-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431520&VOTE=305&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431530&VOTE=306&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431538&VOTE=307&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431539&VOTE=308&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=447308&VOTE=1411&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=447309&VOTE=1412&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=447315&VOTE=1413&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=447317&VOTE=1414&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=447325&VOTE=1415&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=447996&VOTE=1272&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=449570&VOTE=1530&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=451091&VOTE=1569&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback