AL SB19 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2014-373.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Competitive bids, contracts for public works, sealed bids, error in publication does not prevent contract from being bid if authority shows proof of submission of advertisement, Sec. 39-2-2, 41-16-24, 41-16-54 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Competitive bids, contracts for public works, sealed bids, error in publication does not prevent contract from being bid if authority shows proof of submission of advertisement, Sec. 39-2-2, 41-16-24, 41-16-54 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01SenateAssigned Act No. 2014-373.
2014-04-01SenateEnrolled
2014-04-01HouseSignature Requested
2014-04-01SenatePassed Second House
2014-04-01HouseJoned intended to vote "Nay"
2014-04-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 998
2014-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2014-01-28SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 209
2014-01-28SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-01-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback