AL SB189 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-342.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-342.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education budget, appropriations for the support, maintenance, and development of public education
Title
Education budget, appropriations for the support, maintenance, and development of public education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1187 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 989 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 988 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 987 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 691 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 690 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 689 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 989 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 988 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 987 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 691 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 690 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 689 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-342. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1187 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-27 | House | Daniels intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 989 |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 988 |
2021-04-27 | House | Poole Amendment Offered |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 987 |
2021-04-27 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2021-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 691 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 690 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 689 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable with 1 substitute |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
Same As/Similar To
HB297 (Same As) 2021-02-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education