AL SB188 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Compensation, unemployment, to lower weeks of unemployment benefits from 26 to 14 based on the state average unemployment rate, Secs. 25-4-72, 25-4-74 am'd.
Title
Compensation, unemployment, to lower weeks of unemployment benefits from 26 to 14 based on the state average unemployment rate, Secs. 25-4-72, 25-4-74 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business |
2017-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 875 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 672 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Marsh Amendment Offered |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 671 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |