AL SB186 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-387.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Restoration of Voting Rights, application process expedited, notification regarding procedures and eligibility required, Sec. 15-22-36.1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restoration of Voting Rights, application process expedited, notification regarding procedures and eligibility required, Sec. 15-22-36.1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-387.
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04HouseMooney intended to vote "Nay"
2016-05-04HouseEngland motion to Suspend Rules adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-04SenatePassed Second House
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 911
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2016-04-19SenateEngrossed
2016-04-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 627
2016-04-19SenateColeman-Madison motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 626
2016-04-19SenateColeman-Madison Amendment Offered
2016-04-19SenateColeman-Madison motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 625
2016-04-19SenateConstitution, Ethics and Elections first Substitute Offered
2016-04-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-02-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback