AL SB184 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to the Department of Corrections; to add Section 14-1-25 to the Code of Alabama 1975, to provide that the Department of Corrections may expend funds to further the mission of the department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Department of Corrections; to add Section 14-1-25 to the Code of Alabama 1975, to provide that the Department of Corrections may expend funds to further the mission of the department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-31 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 77 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Adopt T7ZZ15-1 (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01SenateEnacted
2023-06-01SenateEnrolled
2023-05-31SenateConcur In and Adopt
2023-05-31HouseRead a Third Time and Pass as Amended
2023-05-31HouseAdopt T7ZZ15-1
2023-05-31HouseOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-17HouseRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-17HouseReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-17HouseAmendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means General Fund T7ZZ15-1
2023-05-17HouseReported Favorably from House Ways and Means General Fund
2023-05-11HouseReferred to Committee to House Ways and Means General Fund
2023-05-11SenateRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-11SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-11SenateOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-12SenateRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-12SenateReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-12SenateReported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
2023-04-06SenateIntroduced and Referred to Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
2023-04-06SenateRead First Time in House of Origin

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/SB184-int.pdf
Texthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/SB184-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/T7ZZ15-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-FIWXCD-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-FIWXCD-2.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-FIWXCD-3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc672
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1075
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1076
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1167

Bill Comments

feedback