AL SB183 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Assigned Act No. 2021-317.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Assigned Act No. 2021-317.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Nursing, licensed nurses, delegation of certain tasks to nonlicensed persons authorized, prohibit agency other than board to certify or train licensed nurses in order to delegate nursing care
Title
Board of Nursing, licensed nurses, delegation of certain tasks to nonlicensed persons authorized, prohibit agency other than board to certify or train licensed nurses in order to delegate nursing care
Sponsors
Sen. Vivian Figures [D] | Sen. Linda Coleman-Madison [D] | Sen. Bobby Singleton [D] | Sen. Rodger Smitherman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 915 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - HBIR: Gray motion to Adopt Roll Call 914 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 213 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 212 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - HBIR: Gray motion to Adopt Roll Call 914 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 213 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 212 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-317. |
2021-04-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 915 |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 213 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |