AL SB181 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Assigned Act No. 2017-149.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Assigned Act No. 2017-149.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
United Way and united appeal funds, tax exemption from all taxes, certain existing funds deemed included, Tax Exemption Reform Act of 2017, Sec. 40-9-12 am'd.
Title
United Way and united appeal funds, tax exemption from all taxes, certain existing funds deemed included, Tax Exemption Reform Act of 2017, Sec. 40-9-12 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-149. |
2017-04-11 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 442 |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 238 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 237 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Figures Amendment Offered |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Figures motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |