AL SB181 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned Act No. 2014-247.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned Act No. 2014-247.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lyman Ward Military Academy, appropriation
Title
Lyman Ward Military Academy, appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-247. |
2014-03-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-03-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 853 |
2014-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 607 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |