AL SB180 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-547.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-547.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public water systems, notification to State Health Officer required when changes made to fluoride levels
Title
Public water systems, notification to State Health Officer required when changes made to fluoride levels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-547. |
2018-03-27 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1030 |
2018-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 249 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |