AL SB180 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Marsh motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Marsh motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Development Office and Director of Development changed to Commerce Department and Secretary of Commerce, assistant secretaries of commerce, employment of certain persons outside of Merit System, authorized, Secs. 41-9-201, 41-9-202, 41-9-202.1, 41-9-203, 41-9-204 am'd.
Title
Alabama Development Office and Director of Development changed to Commerce Department and Secretary of Commerce, assistant secretaries of commerce, employment of certain persons outside of Merit System, authorized, Secs. 41-9-201, 41-9-202, 41-9-202.1, 41-9-203, 41-9-204 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Marsh motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-06-09 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-06-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1165 | |
2011-06-09 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1164 | |
2011-06-09 | Economic Development and Tourism first Substitute Offered | |
2011-06-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-04-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism | |
2011-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 207 | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Job Creation and Economic Development |