AL SB18 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the State Board of Prothetists and Orthotists; to amend Sections 34-25A-3, 34-25A-5, and 34-25A-8 of the Code of Alabama 1975, to require national boards making certifications
Title
Relating to the State Board of Prothetists and Orthotists; to amend Sections 34-25A-3, 34-25A-5, and 34-25A-8 of the Code of Alabama 1975, to require national boards making certifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Senate | Enacted |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-25 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-25 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-11 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported Favorably from House Health |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred to Committee to House Health |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-27 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Healthcare |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Healthcare |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Prefiled |